Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ault Chiropractic, Llp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Small, Arthur Atwell, against Icrco, Inc, represented by Rogers, Nathan C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Enforcement Of Judgment (20) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
|
Case Cycle Time245 days |
81290Ackno006912
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 81290Ackno006912 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed hrg: 7/12/2021 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Debtor's Examination Hearing via Zoom; Meeting ID 959 8605 7786; Password 3544717 Tentative Removed from calendar by request of plaintiff.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
May 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Debtor's Examination Hearing via Zoom; Meeting ID 959 8605 7786; Password 3544717 Tentative
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
May 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Debtor's Examination Hearing via Zoom; Meeting ID 959 8605 7786; Password 3544717 Tentative Debtor's Examination, appearances required.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed Removing Order For Examination From the Court's Calendar |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.