Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capritto, Paul, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Scheiblauer, Kiki, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Petition Re:Arbitration Award (11) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Confirm Arbitration Award Tentative Ruling: Defendant has filed bankruptcy, and this case will be stayed.
Judge: Judge Pauline Maxwell |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition: Confirm Arbitration
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings, Filed | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.