Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eco Property Group Llc, Macfarlane, Roger, Morongo Equity Partners I Llc, Newby, Scott Edwin, Owens, Eli, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sheik, Shahrokh, against Morongo Equity Partners Ii Llc, Morongo Equity Partners I Llc, Reprop Investments Inc, Snider, David, Snider Interests Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Armstrong, John R, Ryan, James T, Forouzandeh, Robert B, Hall, Howard D, Rogers, Nathan C, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management168 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Contract (37) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption
Date: May 26, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Separate Statement, Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Separate Statement, Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Motion: Preliminary Injunction
Date: December 10, 2019Answer, Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Motion: Quash
Date: August 31, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Order, Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: October 15, 2020Response, Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 07, 2020Demurrer, Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Answer, Filed
Date: October 15, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 13, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Objection, Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Objection, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Notice Re:Transferred Action/Notice of Case Assignment,Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Motion: Quash
Date: January 19, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Order, Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Response, Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Response, Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Order, Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: May 25, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 23, 2019Opposition, Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: June 02, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Motion: Leave
Date: June 09, 2020Order, Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Motion: Transfer
Date: September 01, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Order, Filed
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Response, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: December 28, 2020Statement-Agreement or Non-Agreement, Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: January 05, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: June 15, 2021Response, Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: March 16, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 26, 2021CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: July 06, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Settlement Conference
Date: June 25, 2021Hearing
Date: November 02, 2021Order, Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Response, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Response, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Request for Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Request for Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Brief, Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Motion: Amend
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Request for Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Request for Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Request for Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Brief, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Request, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: November 13, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: September 25, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Order, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: May 27, 2020Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: January 03, 2020Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: May 27, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: July 29, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: July 29, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Supplemental Declaration, Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: March 16, 2021Memo of Costs - Snider Parties
Date: February 05, 2022MTS or Tax Costs Trial Phase 1_final (pos)
Date: February 15, 2022ex parte
Date: February 16, 2022OC85850. Reply
Date: February 17, 2022Opposition to Buhrman Ex Parte-final
Date: February 16, 2022Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: February 17, 2022Demurrer to First Amended Derivative Complaint
Date: February 17, 2022Demurrer to First Amended Derivative Complaint - RJN
Date: February 17, 2022Demurrer to First Amended Complaint - RJN
Date: February 17, 2022MEMO2
Date: February 17, 2022MTS or Tax Costs Trial Phase 1 - Buhrman
Date: February 18, 202253704CaseM0010f6
Date: February 19, 2022Ex Parte App. for Order Dissolving Prelim. Injunction or Shortening Time - Suppl Brief
Date: February 22, 2022Ex Parte App. for Order Dissolving Prelim. Injunction or Shortening Time
Date: February 22, 2022ECO v. Snider_Notice of Appeal_02.22.22
Date: February 22, 20222.23.22 CMC Statement
Date: February 24, 2022Suppl Brief ISO Defendants' Demurrers to FAC and FADC
Date: February 25, 2022CMC Stmt for CMC on 2022-03-02 - Snider Parties
Date: February 25, 2022CMC Supplemental Brief
Date: March 01, 2022MTS Costs of Snider Parties - Opp
Date: March 03, 2022MTS Costs of Snider Parties - Opp - Index of Exs v4
Date: March 03, 2022ECO_Notice Designating Record
Date: March 04, 2022Opposition to Motion to Strike or Tax Costs
Date: March 05, 2022Reply - MTS or Tax Costs Trial Phase 1
Date: March 08, 2022Reply - Motion to Tax Snider Costs
Date: March 08, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Cross-Appeal
Date: March 15, 202203212022154804-0001
Date: March 21, 2022AR Clients CIS (pos)
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email
Date: March 24, 2022Notice Designating Record on Appeal - MEPI
Date: April 05, 2022Ntc of Entry of Judgment with Costs - Trial Phase 1
Date: April 07, 2022Writ of Execution - Decl
Date: April 07, 2022Writ of Execution
Date: April 07, 2022Writ of Execution against ECO - Decl
Date: April 15, 2022Writ of Execution against ECO
Date: April 15, 2022Writ of Execution against S2S
Date: April 15, 2022Writ of Execution against S2S - Decl
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Suppl Brief
Date: July 13, 2022MacFarlane Brief re Claim of Exemption
Date: July 13, 2022Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: April 09, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: December 29, 2020Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Receipt, Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Hearing
Date: October 12, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: January 08, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: January 08, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: February 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Complaint, Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Amended Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: July 09, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: May 27, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: May 12, 2020Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Opposition, Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 17, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Order, Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 05, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Errata
Date: September 29, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside CA, Issued By Clerk
Date: October 15, 2021Application, Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Exhibit List, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Witness List, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Witness List, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside CA, Issued By Clerk
Date: December 06, 2021Application, Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Brief, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 07, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Judgment, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: April 06, 2022Claim of Exemption
Date: July 20, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition to Claim of Exemption, Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Claim of Exemption
Date: July 06, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Motion: Tax Costs
Date: March 15, 2022Order, Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: March 08, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Judgment, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption, Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Appeal, Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Brief, Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal, Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Brief, Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: January 18, 2022Order, Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Order, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary), Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Order, Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Statement of Decision, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Cross Appeal, Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary), Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Writ of Execution, Issued
Date: April 15, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Brief, Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Brief, Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Cross Appeal, Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name, Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Order, Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: March 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Writ of Execution, Issued
Date: April 21, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Brief, Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Demurrer
Date: December 01, 2020Objection, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 01, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Motion: Preliminary Injunction
Date: February 23, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference PHASE II Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed Filed on 7/20/22 |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order, Filed Filed on 7/20/22 |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Claim of Exemption Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Claim of Exemption: Denied |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Denying Claim of Exemption |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Suppl Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.