Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aec Yield Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hansen, Chance M, against Cotter, William D, Orozco, Joshua C, Platinum Sales Group, Llc, represented by Brammer, James Brady, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time195 days |
Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: June 17, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: June 10, 2020Judgment
Date: December 19, 2019First Paper - Unlimited Civil
Date: February 07, 2020Notice
Date: December 19, 2019Reply
Date: March 18, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: March 12, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration
Date: February 07, 2020Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister - State Judgment
Date: December 19, 2019Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: June 10, 2020Statement
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration
Date: March 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Stipulation and Order to Vacate Judgment Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Stipulation and Order to Vacate Judgment |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Vacate Judgment, Forbearance Agreement and Payment Plan, and Entry of Judgment Motion hearings - Predispo Defendants' Motion to Vacate Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Stipulation and Order to Vacate Judgment Proof of Mailing |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Vacate Judgment, Forbearance Agreement and Payment Plan, and Entry of Judgment in the Event of Default, and Order Stipulation and Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration of Brady Brammer in Support of Defendants' Reply Motion hearings - Postdispo Defendants' Motion to Vacate Judgment on Sister-State Judgment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Defendants have failed to make the necessary showing that they have a meritorious defense to the sister state action and therefore failed to carry their burden. In contrast, the Plaintiff has established that the New York Court properly rendered judgment and the judgment is therefore entitled to "full faith and credit" under the U.S. Const. Art. IV, 1, and should be given the same effect as though it had been a final judgment rendered by a California Court. Therefore, the Motion is denied. |
|
June 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendants have failed to make the necessary showing that they have a meritorious defense to the sister state action and therefore failed to carry their burden. In contrast, the Plaintiff has establis...
Judge: Stephen E Benson |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Vacate and Order Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Vacate Sister-State Judgment and Order on Stipulation Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Vacate Sister-State Judgment and Order on Stipulation Proof of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.