Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Craddock, Leeann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arnold, Barrick James, against Dupre, Jason, represented by Barrica, Gino G, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2019 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial550 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Leeann Craddock against Jason Dupre. The complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Butte. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civi...
Case Management Conference
Date: June 10, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: February 11, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 26, 2020Complaint
Date: December 12, 20193-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access
Date: March 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 Days Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference 4 Days Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address as to Plaintiff's Attorney Change of Address |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | 3-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer-Response-Denial Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.