Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Goleta, Miner, Sumaya Newland, Newland, Jeffrey M, Newland, Omar J, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Ditfurth, Scott W, against Crofts, Justin, Miner, Sumaya Newland, Newland, Jeffrey M, Newland, Omar J, Newland, Omar J, (total of 6) See All represented by Amspoker, Todd A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Eminent Domain/Inv Cond (14) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
2022.07.08 List of Expert Witnesses and Statements of Valuation Data
Date: July 08, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: August 19, 2019Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2019Case Management Order, Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2020Application, Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: April 27, 2020Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 27, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: May 26, 2020Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: March 19, 2020Objection, Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Order, Filed
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 16, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 28, 2020Motion
Date: October 16, 2019Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: November 01, 2019Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: August 14, 2019Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Goleta v. Newland - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Notice of Pendency of Action, Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: August 19, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Report, Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: October 15, 2019Order, Filed
Date: October 17, 2019Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Document, Filed
Date: April 28, 2020Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: June 16, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Document, Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Document, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Goleta Newland - Proposed Judgmt
Date: January 18, 2023Goleta Newland - Stipulation for Judgment
Date: January 19, 2023Goleta Newland - Proposed Judgment
Date: January 19, 20232023.04.26 Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.04.26 Request for Dismissal | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Goleta Newland - Stipulation for Judgment | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Goleta Newland - Proposed Judgment | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Goleta Newland - Proposed Judgmt | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Goleta v. Newland - Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Goleta v. Newland - Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order, Filed |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stip to Continue Trial and Proposed Order Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.07.08 List of Expert Witnesses and Statements of Valuation Data |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.