Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Helfrick, Joseph, against Espinoza, Isaac A, represented by Moskalensky, Orit, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint, Filed | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.