Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Twenty Four 7 Moving Specialists, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Bruce W, against Raubertus, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Collections (09) |
Time To Trial271 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 08, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Compel Responses Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: Judge Pauline Maxwell |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel, Filed | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.