Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
California Department Of Transportation-Legal Division, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Boyd-Farrell, Rhys Cameron, against Ordelas, Terrence Benjamin, represented by Hannon, John, Ii, Mohamed, Aaron J., in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
IMG_0002bm
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 29, 2022Stipulation to Continue CMC - Ornelas 6-10-22
Date: June 10, 202220220630 - Ornelas - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Calendar Call
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 20220630 - Ornelas - Request for Dismissal | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Continue CMC - Ornelas 6-10-22 | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Hearing
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | IMG_0002bm | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Stevens, Samuel |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Predisposition Hearing
Judge: Stevens, Samuel |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.