Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N, against Zerman, Leonard A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address, Filed | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.