Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Guzman, Crystal A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Venue, Filed | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.