Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccormack, Campbell, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Owen, Andrew, against City Of Carpinteria, County Of Santa Barbara, represented by Dawood, Christopher E, George, Joshua M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order, Filed | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.