Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cara, Grace Gail, against Vazquez, Loida, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.