Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zimmermann, Josie Sue, against Welsh, Juli, represented by Starrett, Carl H, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management229 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | General Denial, Filed | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.