Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jove Usa Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Waecker, Mark, against Hoyle, Esmee L, Hoyle, Paul, represented by Carney, R Mark, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time361 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.