Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Delacruz, Eric, Delacruz, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Collections (09) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment, Filed | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.