Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Goldsmith, Barbara, Goldsmith, Melvyn, Goldsmith, Melvyn S, Pinsky, Elizabeth, Pinsky, Milton, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Grokenberger, David M, against Pinsky, Elizabeth, Pinsky, Milton, represented by Granet, Craig S, Tappeiner, David J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Real Property (26) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
2022.04.14 NOE to Exhibit List
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to Goldsmith Trial Brief
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to RJN of Gov Documents
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to RJN of Aerial Photographs
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to RJN of Related Judgment
Date: April 14, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Answer, Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 19, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 12, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: October 02, 2019Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Trial Brief, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Statement, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Statement, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Answer, Filed
Date: December 19, 2019Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Settlement Conference
Date: February 18, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 04, 2019Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Motion, Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Reply, Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Demurrer/Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2019Opposition, Filed
Date: November 26, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 10, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 26, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 02, 2021CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Milt Pinsky
Date: June 24, 2022Mike Arnold
Date: June 24, 2022Terry Ryken
Date: June 24, 20222022.06.24 Amended List of Exhibits
Date: June 24, 2022Nicole Levine - Vol 1
Date: June 24, 2022Greg Feet
Date: June 24, 2022BarbaraCarulloGoldsmithTran
Date: June 24, 2022Sherry Lawson
Date: June 24, 2022Pinskys' Amended Exhibit List 06-24-22
Date: June 24, 20222022.06.24 Ntc of Lodging Depos
Date: June 24, 2022Doug Zylstra
Date: June 24, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 20, 2022Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: April 20, 2022Second Amended Exhibit List 07-13-22
Date: July 13, 2022Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Abstract of Judgment 12-22-23
Date: December 22, 20232022.04.14 NOE to Witness List
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to Stmt of the Case
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.14 NOE to MIL No 1
Date: April 14, 2022Lee Gabler_Reduced
Date: August 22, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Document, Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Certificate, Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Amended Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Errata
Date: September 05, 2019Demurrer, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment, Filed
Date: May 20, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Exhibit List, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Witness List, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Third Amended Exhibit List 09-08-22
Date: September 08, 2022Exhibit List, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Witness List, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: April 14, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: June 24, 2022Exhibit List, Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Exhibit List, Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Deposition, Lodged
Date: August 22, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Exhibit List, Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Court Trial
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Declaration of Craig S. Granet 09-19-22
Date: September 19, 2022List of Issues 09-19-22
Date: September 19, 20222022.09.19 Goldsmith Fee Decl
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 16, 20222022.09.23 Amended Proof of Service of Proposed Stmt of Dec
Date: September 23, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 19, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Stipulation Requesting Amendment to Court's Statement of Decision
Date: October 07, 2022GoldsmithPinskyProposedJudgment
Date: November 03, 20222022.11.08 Ntc of Entry of Judgment
Date: November 09, 20222023.08.01 Notice of Firm Change
Date: August 01, 2023List of Witnesses and Expert Witnesses
Date: April 14, 2022Brief Statement of the Case
Date: April 14, 2022Exhibit List
Date: April 14, 2022Trial Brief
Date: April 14, 20222022.04.13 Goldsmith Statement of the Case
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 RJN of Aerial Photographs
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 Goldsmith Witness List
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 Goldsmith Exhibit List
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 MIL re Site Visit
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 RJN of Related Judgment
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 RJN of Governing Documents
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.13 Goldsmith Trial Brief
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment 12-22-23 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.08.01 Notice of Firm Change | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.11.08 Ntc of Entry of Judgment | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | GoldsmithPinskyProposedJudgment | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Requesting Amendment to Court's Statement of Decision | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service, Filed Amended POS of Goldsmith's Proposed Findings/Conclusions for Stmt of Decision |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.23 Amended Proof of Service of Proposed Stmt of Dec | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Court Trial Day 7: Held |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Day 7 Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Court Trial Day 6: Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.