Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wysocki, Michelle, Wysocki, Philip, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Schaffer, Dylan Leon, against Csaa Insurance Exchange, represented by Ritton, Jaime Y, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2019 |
Category(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Time To Trial521 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: September 08, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: October 31, 2019Settlement Conference
Date: January 04, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2020Trial Readiness Conference
Date: November 04, 2021Settlement Conference
Date: October 13, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: November 20, 2020Jury Trial
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 24, 2021Order Dismissing Action
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 08, 2020Order
Date: July 24, 2020Jury Trial
Date: February 08, 2021Trial Readiness Conference
Date: February 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Production and Dissemination of Trade Secret Jury Trial 7 Day Time Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Status Conference Reported as Settled, Dismissal to be Filed Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Production and Dissemination of Trade Secret Trial Readiness Conference 7 Day Time Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant CSAA Insurance Exchange's Answer to First Amended Complaint Settlement Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Unconditional Settlement Notice of Hearing Request for Unconditional Settlement; Request for Dismissal |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.