Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Francodollar Lcc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ochoa Rangel, Rosario Bruno, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims: 0 - 1,500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time538 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Symons, Ariadne |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Symons, Ariadne |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.