Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Charles W. Barton Jr., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Hare Construction, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryPetition Re:Arbitration Award Unlimited (11) |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Filed) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Issued) | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Filed) | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.