Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paladini, Renee, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Joens, Samuel Wayne, against Holman, Ray, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Commercial Limited (31) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC: Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ (Filed) | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) Napa County POSSESSION ONLY |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ (Filed) | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment: Clerk's Judgment for Possession | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | UD: Judgment Against All Def Within 60 Days | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) Napa County POSSESSION ONLY |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.