Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Berry, Charles J, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Napa County Office Of Education, Pope Valley Elementary Unified School District, represented by Darmagnac, Kathleen Lynn, Leone, Louis Anthony, Symonds, Megan M, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonique S. Langhorne Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2019 |
CategoryDefamation Unlimited (13) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions182 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time288 days |
19CV000733_Demurrer_RJN
Date: April 19, 202419CV000733_Dec_of_VAL_ISO_Meet_and_Confer
Date: April 19, 202419CV0007333_POS
Date: April 19, 202419CV000733_Demurrer_Notice
Date: April 19, 202419CV000733_Demurrer_MPA
Date: April 19, 2024POS Cover Page
Date: April 10, 2024Motion for Attorneys' Fees - Dec of TPM
Date: April 10, 2024Motion for Attorneys' Fees - [Proposed] Order
Date: April 10, 2024Motion for Attorneys' Fees - RJN
Date: April 10, 2024Motion for Attorneys' Fees - Notice MPA
Date: April 10, 2024Dec JEJ Mtn for Atty Fee
Date: March 28, 2024Dec KLD ISO Mtn for Atty Fee
Date: March 28, 2024MPA ISO Mtn Atty Fee
Date: March 28, 2024Ntc Mtn Atty Fee
Date: March 28, 2024PVUESD Dec Re Meet and Confer
Date: March 19, 2024Dec JEJ ISO RJN to Dem TAC
Date: March 19, 2024Ntc of Dem and Dem TAC
Date: March 19, 2024RJN ISO Demurrer TAC
Date: March 19, 2024MPA ISO Demurrer TAC
Date: March 19, 2024CMC Stmt.1.24.22
Date: January 25, 202219CV000733_CMC_Statement_2_15_22
Date: January 25, 202219CV000733_CMC_Statement_2_15_22_2
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: March 09, 2022Decl. of KLD re 30-Day Ext to Respond to TAC
Date: March 10, 202219CV000733_Declaration_f_ay_extension_3_11_22
Date: March 11, 2022FINAL - BurkhartDecl. w Exhs
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL - POS re MTS Anti-SLAPP
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL-RJN iso Anti-SLAPP with Exhs
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Notice_of_Mot_ial_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL - Ntc of Anti-SLAPP
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL - MPA iso Anti-SLAPP with TOA and TOC
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL KLDdecl
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_MPA_iso_Special_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Dec_of_JCM_is_ial_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Dec_of_Zikmun_ial_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Proof_of_Serv_ial_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_RFJN_iso_Special_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL - Re-Ntc of Anti-SLAPP
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Proposed_Orde_ial_Motion_to_Strike
Date: April 08, 2022Am -Ntc of Anti-SLAPP
Date: April 08, 202219CV000733_Dec_of_Judy_A_al_Motiont_to_Strike
Date: April 11, 2022Ntc of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: April 15, 2022Amended POS re MTS Anti-SLAPP
Date: May 05, 2022NCOE Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Reply
Date: May 05, 2022Proposed Order of Formal Motion
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Formal Motion
Date: June 09, 2022MPA ISO Formal Motion
Date: June 09, 2022Dec JEJ ISO Formal Motion
Date: June 09, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo
Date: June 14, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo RJN
Date: June 14, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo RJN Dec
Date: June 14, 2022Final.Mtn for Clarification Oppo
Date: June 14, 2022Final.Mtn for Reconsideration Oppo
Date: June 14, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo
Date: June 15, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo RJN Dec
Date: June 15, 2022Final.Mtn to Amend FoAC Oppo RJN
Date: June 15, 202219CV000733_Joinder_in_Op_for_Reconsideration
Date: June 22, 202219CV000733_Joinder_in_Op_on_for_Clarification
Date: June 22, 202219CV000733_Joinder_in_Op_on_to_Amend_Pleading
Date: June 22, 2022Final.Reply ISO Formal Motion
Date: June 27, 2022Final.Second Dec JEJ ISO Formal Motion
Date: June 27, 2022CMC.Stmt.7.27.22
Date: June 28, 2022CMC Statement (07-27-22 hearing)
Date: June 28, 2022Final.Proposed Judgment
Date: July 15, 2022Respondent's Proposed Amendments to the Settled Statement
Date: September 06, 2022Respondent's Proposed Amendments to Revised Settled Statement (signed)
Date: October 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFENDANT NAPA COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES. Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFENDANT POPE VALLEY UNION ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF NO LESS THAN $9,181.50 IN ATTORNEYS FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF CHARLES J. BERRY AS PREVAILING PARTY IN SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTI-SLAPP) Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Re: Attorney's Fees Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition or Objections PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO PVUESD AND NCOE MOTIONS FOR "ANTI-SLAPP" ATTORNEY FEES |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 19CV000733_Demurrer_RJN | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 19CV000733_Dec_of_VAL_ISO_Meet_and_Confer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.