Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Joseph, Samuel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rains, Michael, against City Of Atwater, Creighton, Paul, Raymond, Brian, Vierra, Cindy, represented by Christian, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management157 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
Category(36): Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
June 13, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 19CV-05388 Samuel Joseph vs Cindy Vierra, et al. Case Management Conference Appearance Required. Remote appearances are encouraged. Parties who wish to appear remotely should contact the clerk of the ... | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 25, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | 19CV-05388 Samuel Joseph v. Cindy Vierra, et al. Case Management Conference As a result of the reduction in court services due to the COVID-19 pandemic, there is currently a backlog of criminal trials... | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.