Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hubbard, Antoine, Senior, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Virag, Brian J, against Bnz Diversified Corp, Fornia Hospitality Group, Llc, represented by Rosenthal, Brian A., in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management153 days |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
||
Letter
Date: December 11, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: November 25, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Receipt | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.