Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha A National Banking Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macleod James, against Akopian Tiran, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: James MacLeod (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 18, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Reasonable Diligence
Date: February 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 06, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: July 23, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration in support
Date: July 23, 2021Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: August 03, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 17, 2021Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: September 16, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of service by mail
Date: September 16, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 27, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 24, 2022Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 24, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 09, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.