Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Unifund Ccr Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian John P., against Flores Brenda, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Declaration in RE: C.C.P. 1033; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: UNIFUND CCR, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 04, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 04, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 04, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: January 02, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 02, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: January 02, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Non Military Status
Date: November 23, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60
Date: November 23, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in RE: C.C.P. 1033
Date: November 23, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: November 30, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: December 10, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)
Date: September 01, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: October 20, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.