Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon John E., against Walenta Selfie M Aka Selfie Walenta, represented by Moreno-Cortez S. Jenna, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Karen Moskowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 20, 2021Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: SELFIE M WALENTA (Defendant); As to: SELFIE M WALENTA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 06, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 06, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 03, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: May 07, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Civil
Date: December 07, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 07, 2020Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment
Date: March 24, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: March 24, 2021Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: to Vacate the Stay and Enter Judgment
Date: March 24, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Stipulated Judgment)
Date: March 30, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice : Motion for Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation
Date: April 06, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: April 21, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 10, 2021Stipulated Judgment - Stipulated Judgment
Date: May 20, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 03, 2021Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: SELFIE M WALENTA (Defendant); As to: SELFIE M WALENTA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.