Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wong Jennifer, against Lett Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of entry of judgment; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: Non active Military Status; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: April 22, 2022Default entered as to Kathryn Lett; On the Complaint filed by Citibank, N.A. on
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: CCP 1033; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: Non-Active Military Status; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Attachment - Attachment
Date: January 09, 2020Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 29, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 06, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Non-Active Military Status
Date: February 06, 2020Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case
Date: February 06, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: CCP 1033
Date: February 06, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: March 17, 2020Attachment - Attachment
Date: March 17, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 03, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of entry of judgment
Date: April 03, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Non active Military Status
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 16, 2022Default Judgment; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: Non-Active Military Status; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Declaration Re: CCP 1033; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of entry of judgment; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Lett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Default entered as to Kathryn Lett; On the Complaint filed by Citibank, N.A. on 11/06/2019
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.