Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wescom Central Credit Union A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rocha Karel G, against Johnson Melanie Tonya Aka Melanie Johnson An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 05, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 05, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: January 23, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Law firm Name
Date: February 05, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 05, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: February 10, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: March 09, 2020Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting
Date: April 20, 2021Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)
Date: April 20, 2021Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO)
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 20, 2022Request for Dismissal; Filed by: WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.