Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Asset Capital Recovery Group Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian John P., against Elamon Regina Aka Regina Crawford Aka Regina Dukhovny Aka Jenny Crawford, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions195 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 04, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: March 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 17, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN RE: C.C.P 1033
Date: March 17, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF NON MILITARY STATUS
Date: March 17, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 17, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: March 24, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: September 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.