Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide Flint C, against Moss Lara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LARA MOSS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice OF SUBMISSION; Filed by: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LARA MOSS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 19, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: May 18, 2020Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion
Date: January 18, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 18, 2022Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: January 18, 2022Notice (name extension) - Notice OF SUBMISSION
Date: January 18, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: January 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 18, 2022Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order AGREEMENT
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: April 18, 2022Order (name extension) - Order ENFORCING SETTLEMENT
Date: August 12, 2022Judgment - Judgment
Date: August 12, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 18, 2022Notice of OSC (Name Extension) - Notice of OSC (Name Extension) of osc
Date: August 18, 2022Complaint; Filed by: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LARA MOSS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.