Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Danielyan Elmira, against Bonaobra Glen C, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: July 29, 2019Complaint - Complaint for Money: Account Stated
Date: July 29, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re:Nonmilitary Status
Date: July 29, 2019Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: December 24, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 27, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 07, 2022Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: June 07, 2022Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.