Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook Jordan David, against Jay Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint - Complaint
Date: July 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 29, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: July 29, 2019Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 23, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: November 05, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 06, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non- Appearance
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 06, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: March 12, 2021Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: March 14, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 14, 2022Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non- Appearance
Date: March 14, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: October 04, 2022Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of 01/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: NICOLE JAY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.