Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Fedex Corporate Services Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bui Long K, against Odiaka Emeka L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time423 days |
Declaration in support of Computaion of Interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. on
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration of interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Default entered as to Emeka L Odiaka; On the Complaint filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. on
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration Re: CCP Section 1033; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration of interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Emeka L Odiaka (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. on
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 02, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: July 02, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: July 02, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of Computaion of Interest
Date: August 22, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 22, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 22, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: CCP Section 1033
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of interest
Date: August 27, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of interest
Date: September 13, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 04, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: October 10, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)
Date: December 20, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Declaration of interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration in support of Computaion of Interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. on 07/02/2019
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration of interest; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Emeka L Odiaka (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Declaration Re: CCP Section 1033; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. on 07/02/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.