Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grigoryan Meline, against Fang Genny, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Karen Moskowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Default entered as to GENNY FANG; On the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GENNY FANG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GENNY FANG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: June 28, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: June 28, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 17, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: CCP 1033; Interest; and Evidence Code 1550
Date: December 17, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: December 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GENNY FANG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GENNY FANG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.