Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert Scott, against Labucay Benjamin V, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin V Labucay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 08, 2023Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: May 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 24, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: May 24, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: August 29, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause
Date: December 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 18, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Conditional Settlement
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: February 16, 2021Order (name extension) - Order Order of Dismissal without Prejudice Pursuant to CCP 664.6
Date: February 22, 2021Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for entry of judgment
Date: February 22, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Date Time & Place of Continued Order
Date: February 23, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 08, 2023Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: February 08, 2023Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: May 01, 2023Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin V Labucay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.