Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert Scott, against Cassidy Caitlin A, represented by Ciccone Adrieannette, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Karen Moskowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 04, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 18, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: April 04, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: May 17, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: May 17, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 17, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: November 05, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 06, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: April 13, 2021Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: May 27, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: June 11, 2021Judgment - Judgment Judgment
Date: November 10, 2021Judgment - Judgment
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...)
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Caitlin A Cassidy (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Adrieannette Ciccone (Attorney)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Caitlin A Cassidy (Defendant); As to: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.