Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barnholtz Brad, Mason Donnie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mason Donnie, represented by Routledge Judith, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Stephen P. Pfahler presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management287 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Cross-Complaint
Date: January 21, 2020Answer
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: January 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/06/2020
Date: April 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 13, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: June 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CCP 128.7 MOTION
Date: August 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BASED ON CROSS COMPLAINT)
Date: September 15, 2020Reply - REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 04, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BASED ON CROSS COMPLAINT)
Date: November 10, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 28, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION EX PARTE
Date: April 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: April 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION RE OSC
Date: October 12, 2021Exhibit List
Date: October 12, 2021Witness List
Date: October 12, 2021Trial Brief
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL RE ORDER 10-14-21
Date: November 23, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S CORRECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 23, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RE COURT'S OCTOBER 14, 2021 ORDERS
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AG...)
Date: November 24, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (2-DAY ESTIMATE); FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORD...)
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff); As to: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to CCP 430.41; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant); As to: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant); As to: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Opposition to CCP 128.7 Motion; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Objection to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Reply Brief on Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Ex Parte; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition to ex parte application; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration re OSC; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration of Defendant's Counsel re Order 10-14-21; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff re Court's October 14, 2021 Orders; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Correction to Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Declaration re Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BASED ON CROSS-COMPLAINANT Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial Date) Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Reply (Brief on Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (Pursuant to CCP 430.41) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Objection (to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Opposition (to CCP 128.7 Motion) Filed by Donnie Mason (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against All Parties for Fai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Ag...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration of Defendant's Counsel re Order 10-14-21 Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (re Order to Show Cause) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (re OSC) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Correction to Notice of Ruling) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff re Court's October 14, 2021 Orders) Filed by Brad Barnholtz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Donnie Mason (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (2-day estimate); Final Status Conference; Ord...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Objection (to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant's Motion for Sanctions per CCP 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint) of )
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: December 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PER CCP 128.7
Date: October 28, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 13, 2021Trial Brief
Date: August 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 05, 2021Exhibit List
Date: August 05, 2021Reply (Brief on Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (Pursuant to CCP 430.41)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Opposition (to CCP 128.7 Motion)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint) of )
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BASED ON CROSS-COMPLAINANT
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against All Parties for Fai...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration of Defendant's Counsel re Order 10-14-21
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) of )
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (re OSC)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Correction to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of )
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (2-day estimate); Final Status Conference; Ord...))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Ag...))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff re Court's October 14, 2021 Orders)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (re Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/06/2020)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (Pursuant to CCP 430.41)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint) of 09/15/2020)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (to CCP 128.7 Motion)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant's Motion for Sanctions per CCP 128.7)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Objection (to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Based on Cross Complaint) of 11/10/2020)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Reply (Brief on Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of 05/13/2021)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) of 04/29/2021)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (re OSC)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Correction to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (re Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Against All Parties for Fai...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Ag...))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff re Court's October 14, 2021 Orders)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.