Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
T. Viole Construction Co. Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Baker Mark, against Torres Iron Work Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 08, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 08, 2019Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY-MECHANIC'S LIEN)
Date: October 30, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY-MECHANIC'S LIEN))
Date: October 30, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.