Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bazan, John Z, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCullers, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2019 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions482 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time523 days |
Answer Filed
Date: July 29, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 12, 2019Request for Judical Notice
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 16, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: November 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Order Granted Motion--Judgment on the Pleadings Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Judgment on Plead
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of No Opposition to Motion |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Judical Notice Request for Judicial Notice |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order Received for Signature |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Proposed Judgment |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Vanessa Thomas in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Notice of and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.