Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobsen, Devin, against Lucatero, Julio C, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2019 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions405 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time405 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: July 17, 2020Order filed
Date: July 21, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 17, 2020Stipulation Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1337029 dec Declaration Filed OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL RE: DEFAULT UNDER STIPULATION |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1337029 pos Proof of Service |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1337029 ord Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Set Aside Dismissal |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1337029 jud Judgment Received Forward to: 404 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1337029 dec v Declaration Filed OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order On Settlement Agreement And Stipulation for Judgment PER CCP 664.6 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Partial Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 on 7/21/2020 Order for: Settlement Agreement; Jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6*** Order Granted forwarded to clerk's office for further processing. *** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.