Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Butcher, Dana, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Robinson, James, Snelling, Gary, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by Plaintiff Dana Butcher against Defendants James Robinson, Gary Selling Jr., and Does 1 to 10. The case number is 19CECL05403. The complaint alleges that the Defendants are unlawfully detaining the ...
Judgment Received
Date: October 01, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 06, 2019Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed
Date: October 01, 2019Return filed
Date: July 19, 2019Request to Enter Default
Date: June 27, 2019Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 05, 2019Writ of Possession Issued
Date: July 01, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: June 06, 2019Proof of Service
Date: June 27, 2019Request for Court Judgment
Date: October 01, 2019Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: June 27, 2019Application for Publication/Posting Order filed
Date: June 11, 2019Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed
Date: June 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
DANA BUTCHER v JAMES ROBINSON-Asgmt of Jgmt Assignment of Judgment Filed Assignment of Judgment |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
DANA BUTCHER v JAMES ROBINSON-Sub of Atty Substitution of Attorney Filed Substitution of Attorney |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work - Post
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received (Forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 10/04/19)Forward to: 404 |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of (Writ of Possession) Filed wholly satisfied. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Entered as to: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.