Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Flagship Credit Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Marquez, Summer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gabriel L. Brickey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management127 days |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2019 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Over $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 21, 2020Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: January 23, 2020Order Denied
Date: February 07, 2020Judgment Received
Date: January 23, 2020Order Denied
Date: October 16, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 22, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 12, 2019Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet
Date: July 11, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 11, 2019Order filed
Date: August 02, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 30, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 12, 2019Request for Court Judgment
Date: February 08, 2021Judgment Received
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
39539Requestf008ca09 Request for Court Judgment |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
39539Judgment0249920 Judgment Received Forward to: Dept 404 on 02/22/21 |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
4184963_640NoticeMar Notice Filed Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from chambers |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
4124175_741CMSMarque Case Management Statement Filed |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Order denying application for default judgment Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.