Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobsen, Devin, against Garcia, Layne, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2019 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Reduced Fee |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: July 10, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 28, 2019Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: November 05, 2020Order filed
Date: July 12, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: July 10, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: July 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 MEMO Memorandum of Costs filed Total Costs: $ 452.55 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 JUD Judgment Received Forward to: 404 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 POS Proof of Service |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 DEC V Declaration Filed OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 ORD Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Set Aside Dismissal |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
1314027 DEC Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL RE: DEFAULT UNDER STIPULATION |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Of Intention to Request Entry of Judgment Under Stipulation |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment Per CCP 664.6 Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.