Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Espindola, Rosa, Espindola, Salvador, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by White, Keith M., against Adams, Cliffton, Jr, Adams, Fred, Brooks, James D, Deshay, Marquis, Hernandez, Soledad, (total of 7) See All represented by Franco, Paul C., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 17, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 10, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 26, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 07, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: June 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 15, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 23, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Amended Document Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: July 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 26, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: November 14, 2019Notice Filed
Date: November 26, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 08, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 14, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: November 14, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 02, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 06, 2020Proof of Service
Date: April 01, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2022Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension
Date: April 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 06, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 17, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 10, 2022Reply filed
Date: March 16, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: November 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed 8/12/21 ~ Jessica Spinola Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
April 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Espindola, et al. v. Brooks, et al. Superior Court Case No. 19CECG04138 Hearing Date: April 28, 2022 (Dept. 502) Motion: Defendants Norcal Gold, Inc. and Soledad Hernandez’s Demurrer to the First ... | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
4-19-22 Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Notice Filed Notice of Change of Handling Attorney |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Strike Jessica Spinola Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
3-22-22 Plaintiff's Amended Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement Filed Amended Case Management Statement Filed |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from Chambers |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
3-21-22 Defendant Norcal Gold & Soledad Hernandez's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement Filed |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/18/22 Case Management Statement Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.