Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Higuera, Martha Emily, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Petition for name change filed
Date: April 02, 2019Name Change OSC Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 08, 2019Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet
Date: July 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Publication |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Fee Waiver |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Denied Last Day to Pay 4/18/19 |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for name change filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.