Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
James Irrigation District, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nicholson, Benjamin T, against Burrell Ditch Company, Clark'S Fork Reclamation District No. 2069, Corcoran Irrigation Company, Crescent Canal Company, Empire West Side Irrigation District, (total of 25) See All represented by Herr, Leonard C., Kahn, David W., Marchini, Joseph M, Mauritson, Aubrey A., Nordstrom, Michael N, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management188 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial647 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions615 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Order Received for Signature
Date: May 02, 2019Stipulation and Order filed
Date: May 08, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 05, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: June 27, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 24, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2019ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: October 09, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: November 06, 2019Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 24, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 13, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 23, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 25, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: September 22, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 07, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 21, 2020Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 09, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 24, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 24, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: March 24, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: May 11, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: March 24, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: March 25, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 07, 2021Order Granted
Date: July 07, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 11, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: August 18, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 16, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 01, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 30, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 16, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2019Civil case cover sheet
Date: March 01, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Answer Filed
Date: June 14, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Answer Filed
Date: July 05, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 04, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 30, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 22, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: September 23, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: August 05, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: August 04, 2022Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 01, 2019Order filed
Date: March 03, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 13, 2022Order Signed and Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted
Date: January 24, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 25, 2023Order Received for Signature
Date: December 29, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: January 03, 2022Motion filed
Date: September 25, 2020Answer Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 14, 2023Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 17, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Order Received for Signature
Date: September 22, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: September 27, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 11, 2023Request Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed Stipulation and Order re: Extension for Responsive Pleadings and Discovery Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sub of Atty (Reed Ditch Company) Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney: Aubrey A. Mauritson New Attorney: Melanie J. Aldridge |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
2-14-23 Stipulation and Order Received Order Received for Signature *order signed and processed on 2/17/23* Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: extension responsive pleadings |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption Claimed Filing fee $20.00 |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Req by both; Time Est. 7-8 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & CM |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Atty Benjamin Nicholson for Plaintiff; Attys Alex Thompson, Nicolas Cardella, Joseph Marchini & Will Jackson for Defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.