Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Savage, Bryan, Savage, Kelly, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Psyogios, Ross J., against Gomez, Michael Alexander, Swift Transportation Co. Of Arizona, Llc, represented by Lim, Derek H., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management127 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial699 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions547 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Order Granted
Date: October 13, 2020Opposition filed
Date: October 23, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 28, 2020Motion filed
Date: January 22, 2021Motion filed
Date: January 22, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 05, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: April 12, 2021Opposition filed
Date: April 15, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: January 22, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 15, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 15, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 05, 2021Order filed
Date: April 13, 2021Statement filed
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: February 02, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 22, 2021Statement filed
Date: January 22, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: January 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 22, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 18, 2020Opposition filed
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 06, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: January 07, 2021Order filed
Date: January 04, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 30, 2020Order filed
Date: December 01, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 19, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 03, 2020Order Granted
Date: October 29, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: October 23, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: October 23, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: October 14, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 27, 2020Order Granted
Date: October 13, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 25, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 16, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: July 27, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 27, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 06, 2020Stipulation Filed
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 05, 2020Reply filed
Date: January 29, 2020Opposition filed
Date: January 23, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: January 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 08, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Order filed
Date: December 03, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: November 20, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 03, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: June 19, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 07, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 12, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 26, 2019Amended Document Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Jury Req by both; 7-10 Days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment w/ Order After PTDC & Certificate of Mailing |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Discovery Conference re: Request filed 8/4/21 Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
46392THIRDAME00cddb8 Amended Document Filed Third Amended Notice of Lien Pursuant to Labor Code 3850-3864 |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Derek Lim (filed 6/2/21) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granted Order on Request for PTDC & Certificate of Mailing; Hearing set on 8/27/21 Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed Forwarded to Dept. 403 Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's request for Pretrial Discovery Conference. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.