Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lovell Tricia filed a(n) Civil case against Raiser Llc, represented by Saidian Rabin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Wendy Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tricia Lovell (Petitioner); As to: Raiser LLC (Respondent)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tricia Lovell (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Petition - PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM
Date: July 10, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 10, 2019Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: July 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: September 26, 2019Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 12, 2019Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: December 03, 2019Order - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM (PROPOSED)
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 12/03/2019)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Petition (for Minor's Compromise of Disputed Claim)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Order (Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim (Proposed))
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Ruling (on Petition to Approve Minor's Compromise of Disputed Claim)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order (to Deposit Money into Blocked Account (Proposed))
Date: December 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.