Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jyoo Joseph, against Cornejo Fidel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeirdre Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions164 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal as to Does 1 to 10 only; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Order of Discharge - Chapter 7; Filed by:
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Default Judgment By Court; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 25, 2019Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: June 25, 2019Complaint
Date: June 25, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 25, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAILING
Date: July 09, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: July 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 27, 2019Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY
Date: October 09, 2019Declaration - SUMMARY OF THE CASE
Date: October 09, 2019Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING THE USE OF COPIES
Date: October 10, 2019Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT
Date: December 06, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: February 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7
Date: May 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: August 02, 2021Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Summary of the Case Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Default Judgment (By Court) Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing) Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 10 only) Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by FIDEL CORNEJO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Permitting the Use of Copies Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 02, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Default Judgment (By Court)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 10 only)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Permitting the Use of Copies
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.